Abrams, Howard Joel (CPSO#: 24636)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joel Abrams Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Abrams ( CPSO# 24636 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS - Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St Regis Crescent S North York, ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Fax: (416) 398-5932
Date Received: 28 May 2018


Address: RSRS Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent South Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: 1-888-398-5932
Date Received: 26 Oct 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018