Abramson, Joy (CPSO#: 93367)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Oct 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
North Tower Room B8-44
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Abramson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Abramson ( CPSO# 93367 )

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
800 Commissioners Road East
North Tower Room B8 44
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 26 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOY ABRAMSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABRAMSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 06 Nov 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Nov 2016 to 18 Nov 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2016