Abrishami, Amir (CPSO#: 93103)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health- St Catherine's Site
Anesthesia Department
1200 Fourth Ave,
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: 905-378-4676
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amir Abrishami Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Abrishami ( CPSO# 93103 )

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
7030 Derry Road
Milton ON  L9T 7H6
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMIR ABRISHAMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABRISHAMI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015