Abu Alsamen, Ahmed Abdel Rahman Mohammad (CPSO#: 77140)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Al-Mustansiriyah, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Mar 2014
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003