Abu Awad, Nasser Abd Aljalil (CPSO#: 96650)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Jordan, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone: (905) 372-6811
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abu Awad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Abu Awad ( CPSO# 96650 )

Business Address:
Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 372-6811

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 18 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NASSER ABD ALJALIL ABU AWAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABU AWAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 18 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2016