Abu Daff, Saleh Nasr S (CPSO#: 92696)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 22 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 05 May 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 May 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jun 2013