Abu Haleeqa, Khaled Ebrahim Mussa Eisa (CPSO#: 79245)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 04 May 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 May 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2003 to 01 Aug 2003
PEAP - Resident - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 02 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 04 May 2012