Abu Rafea, Basim Fouad A (CPSO#: 73020)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: Abu Rafeh, Basem Fouad A (used until: 11 Oct 2004 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Obstetrics and
Gynaecology
800 Commissioners Road, Room E3-641
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: 519 663 3109
Fax: 519 663 3162
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 107
555 Southdale Rd. E
London ON  N6E 1A2
Canada
Phone: (519) 685 5559
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Abu Rafea Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Abu Rafea ( CPSO# 73020 )

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Obstetrics and Gynaecology
Room E3-641
800 Commissioners Road
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 663-3019

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BASIM FOUAD A ABU RAFEA may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DEPARTMENT OF OBSTETRICS & GYNAECOLOGY, THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO in which Dr. ABU RAFEA holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. ABU RAFEA may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. ABU RAFEA no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. ABU RAFEA no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. ABU RAFEA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 19 Aug 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 20 Aug 1999 to 19 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 20 Aug 2000 to 19 Aug 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 20 Aug 2001 to 19 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 20 Aug 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jan 2006
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015