Abu Setteh, Nihad Moosa Abdulla (CPSO#: 80109)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Dec 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Dec 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Dubai Medical College For Girls, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mavis Wellness
5025 Heatherleigh Avenue
Mississauga ON  L5V 2Y7
Phone: (905) 501-9115
Fax: (905) 501-9114
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abu Setteh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Abu Setteh ( CPSO# 80109 )

Business Address:
Mavis Wellness
7 - 5025 Heatherleigh Avenue
Mississauga ON  L5V 2Y7
Phone Number: (905) 501-9115

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NIHAD MOOSA ABDULLA ABU SETTEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABU SETTEH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2003 to 28 Sep 2003
PEAP - Resident - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 08 Oct 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 09 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Sep 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2005