Abu-Zahra, Hakam Tawfic (CPSO#: 24532)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Windsor Regional Cancer Centre 2220 Kildare Rd Windsor, ON N8W 2X3 Tel: (519) 253-5253
Instructions: Medical records location as per above.
Date Received: 11 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1971 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 14 Mar 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018