Abughaduma, Read Mohamed Ali (CPSO#: 76918)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 104
200 Consillium Place
Scarborough ON  M1H 3E4
Phone: (416) 479-8686
Fax: (416) 296-8816
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Read Abughaduma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 06 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Abughaduma ( CPSO# 76918 )

Business Address:
Suite 104
200 Consilium Place
Toronto ON  M1H 3E4
Phone Number: (416) 479-8686

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 24 Jul 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. READ MOHAMED ALI ABUGHADUMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABUGHADUMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 24 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 25 Jul 2002 to 24 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 25 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2006