Abujazia, Abdurrezagh Farag A (CPSO#: 83515)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 03 Dec 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 06 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jul 2005 to 06 Oct 2005
PEAP - Resident - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 07 Oct 2005 to 06 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 07 Oct 2006 to 06 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 07 Oct 2007 to 06 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 07 Oct 2008 to 06 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 07 Oct 2009 to 06 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 06 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 03 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2011