Abujrad, Hussein Abdurrahman (CPSO#: 84138)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Apr 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4th floor
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 88333
Fax: 6137388261
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1194 Evans Ave.
Ottawa ON  K1H 7Z4
Canada
Phone: (613) 521-0999
Fax: 6135210444
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

LEAF Weight Management Clinic
1980 Ogilvie Rd
Ottawa ON  K1J 9L3
Canada
Phone: 613-701-1222
Fax: 613-701-1223
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Diabetes clinic
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abujrad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Abujrad ( CPSO# 84138 )

Business Address:
1194 Evans Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1H 7Z4
Phone Number: (613) 521-0999

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 27 Jul 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HUSSEIN ABDURRAHMAN ABUJRAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABUJRAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 11 Apr 2006 to 26 Jun 2006
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 27 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 28 Jul 2009 to 27 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 28 Jul 2010 to 27 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2011