Abumiddain, Nisreen (CPSO#: 96095)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jan 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Martin Luther University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medica One
2540 Postmaster Drive
Oakville ON  L6M 0N2
Phone: (905) 844-1700
Fax: (905) 844-1705
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abumiddain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 16 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Abumiddain ( CPSO# 96095 )

Business Address:
Medica One
2540 Postmaster Drive
Oakville ON  L6M 0N2
Phone Number: (905) 844-1700

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NISREEN ABUMIDDAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABUMIDDAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2014