Abunaji, Mohamed Abdusalam (CPSO#: 84081)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Mar 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
EMG Lab/Neurology clinic
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 6858
Fax: (905) 813-4046
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

620 Bloor Street
Mississauga ON  L5A 3V9
Canada
Phone: (905) 2771222
Fax: (905) 2772221
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mohamed Abunaji Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Abunaji ( CPSO# 84081 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
Neurology Clinic
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Business Address:
620 Bloor Street
Mississauga ON  L5A 3V9
Phone Number: (905) 277-1222

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 16 Aug 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMED ABDUSALAM ABUNAJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABUNAJI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 27 Mar 2006 to 21 May 2006
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 22 May 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 16 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 17 Aug 2009 to 16 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 17 Aug 2010 to 16 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 17 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 16 Aug 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 May 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2011