Abushawish, Ghassan (CPSO#: 81782)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jan 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jan 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Tichreen, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1824 Concession Dr.
Newbury ON  N0L 1Z0
Phone: (519) 693-7111
Fax: (519) 681-5657
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

310 Juliana Dr,
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Canada
Phone: 519-421-4211
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abushawish Medicine Professional Corporation.

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Abushawish ( CPSO# 81782 )

Business Address:
1824 Cocession Drive
London ON  N0L 1Z0
Phone Number: (519) 693-7111

Business Address:
29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll ON  N5C 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 854-1700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
Four Counties Health Services,Newbury Newbury
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GHASSAN ABUSHAWISH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABUSHAWISH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2004 to 20 Oct 2004
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Oct 2004 to 03 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 04 Aug 2005 to 31 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 17 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2007