Acharya, Chhaya Vipul (CPSO#: 85766)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jan 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:Baroda University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bluewater Health
Department of Laboratory Services
89 Norman street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone: (519) 464-4500 Ext. 5486
Fax: (519) 383-7274
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Acharya C. Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Acharya ( CPSO# 85766 )

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
Department of Laboratory Services
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 454-4500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 31 Jul 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHHAYA VIPUL ACHARYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ACHARYA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Dec 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jan 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2007