Acker, Amy Elizabeth (CPSO#: 79140)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Science Center
Hotel Dieu Hospital Site
Brock 3
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 3362
Fax: (613) 544-3559
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amy Acker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Acker ( CPSO# 79140 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMY ELIZABETH ACKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ACKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007