Ackery, Alun Duncan (CPSO#: 88765)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5095
Fax: (416) 864-5341
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

ORNGE Air Ambulance
5310 Explorer Drive Mississauga, ON
Toronto ON  L4W 5H8
Canada
Phone: (647) 428-2005
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alun Ackery Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ackery ( CPSO# 88765 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Emergency Department
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5095

Business Address:
ORNGE
5310 Explorer Drive
Mississauga ON  L4W 5H8
Phone Number: (647) 428-2005

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 14 Jul 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALUN DUNCAN ACKERY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ACKERY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 14 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 15 Jul 2010 to 14 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 15 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 14 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 15 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2013