Adabachi, Nathalie Marie (CPSO#: 90118)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Feb 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Feb 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber Regional Hospital
2175 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M6M3Z4
Phone: 416 249-8111
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1333 Sheppard Ave. East
Suite 144
Toronto, Ontario
Toronto ON  M2J1V1
Canada
Phone: 4164915900
Fax: 4164911149
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jan 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATHALIE MARIE ADABACHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADABACHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 16 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 15 Dec 2015 to 11 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jan 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2016