Adam, Robert Saul (CPSO#: 82886)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Eye Specialists & Surgeons
801 Eglinton Ave. W. suite 301
Toronto ON  M5N 1E3
Phone: (647) 748-8377
Fax: (416) 619-5539
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Clarity Eye Institute
9135 Keele St.
Unit A5
Vaughan ON  L4K 0J4
Canada
Phone: (416) 663-3937
Fax: (416) 663-3731
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Suite 316 4789 Yonge St
Toronto ON  M2N 0G3
Canada
Phone: 1-888-883-7503
Fax: 6477970224
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Clarity Eye Institute Scarborough
240 Alton Towers Circle
Scarborough ON  M1V 4P3
Canada
Phone: (416) 663-3937
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

St. Joseph's Health Centre
Eye Clinic - Ground Floor
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: (416) 530-6565
Fax: (416) 530-6291
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Adam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 03 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Adam ( CPSO# 82886 )

Business Address:
316-4789 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2N 0G3
Phone Number: (647) 351-6501

Business Address:
First Canadian Place
120-100 King Street West
Toronto ON  M5X 2A1
Phone Number: (416) 362-8677

Business Address:
9135 Keele Street
Unit 5
Vaughan ON  L4K 0J4
Phone Number: (416) 663-3937

Business Address:
Eye Clinic
30 The Queensway
Ground Floor
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6565

Business Address:
801 Eglinton Ave. West
Suite 301
Toronto ON  M5N 1E3
Phone Number: (647) 748-8377

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT SAUL ADAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010