Adams Goldraich, Livia (CPSO#: 96372)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Oct 2018

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2021

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 26 Oct 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Federal University of Rio Grande Do Sul, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Care London
Division of Cardiology
268 Grosvenor St
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6100
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 26 Oct 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 25 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2018
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 26 Oct 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Livia Adams Goldraich may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division of Cardiology, University of Western Ontario, in which Dr.
                        Adams  Goldraich  holds  an  academic  appointment  at  the rank of
                        Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate  of registration automatically expires seven years  from
                  the date of issuance  or  when  Dr.  Adams  Goldraich no longer holds the
                  academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Adams Goldraich's
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not receive an annual report  or  receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes  a  decision  about  Dr. Adams Goldraich's
                        certificate  of  registration,  following  consideration   of   the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is issued on October 26, 2018, and expires on June 30,
                  2021.  Upon renewal  of Dr. Adams Goldraich's academic appointment at the
                  University of Western  Ontario,  the expiry date can be extended, subject
                  to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.