Adams, Risa Marie (CPSO#: 91575)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Feb 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Feb 2014

Summary

Former Name: Mandzuk, Risa Marie (used until: 23 Jan 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
247-5420 Hwy 6 N
Guelph
Guelph ON  N1H 6J2
Phone: (519) 352-0213
Fax: (519) 352-0213
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RISA MARIE ADAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADAMS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 02 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 03 Jan 2011 to 30 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2014