Adamson, Matthew William (CPSO#: 110477)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
381 Church Street
PO Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7373
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4 Campbell Drive
PO Box 5003
Uxbridge ON  L9P 1S4
Canada
Phone: (905) 852-9771 Ext. 5261
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew Adamson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Adamson ( CPSO# 110477)

Business Address:
Uxbridge Cottage Hospital
4 Campbell Drive
Uxbridge ON  L9P 1S4
Phone Number: (905) 852-9771

Business Address:
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7373

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Jun 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW WILLIAM ADAMSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADAMSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2016 to 28 Aug 2016
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2017