Adas, Reem Ahmed Abbas (CPSO#: 92545)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 29 Feb 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Feb 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 2010 to 26 Mar 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Ottawa, 27 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 29 Feb 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Feb 2012