Adatia, Adil (CPSO#: 110648)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2018

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADIL ADATIA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ADATIA is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. ADATIA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ADATIA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ADATIA shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ADATIA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ADATIA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 29 Aug 2016 to 23 Sep 2016
Elective Trainee - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 05 Jun 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Elective Trainee - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018