Addleman, Benjamin (CPSO#: 78361)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: French

Education:Dalhousie University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2002 to 30 Aug 2002
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2003 to 31 Jan 2003
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004