Ade-Conde, Adetunji James (CPSO#: 97205)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:University of Lagos, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Hills Womens Centre
118 Mill St
Georgetown ON  L7G 2C5
Phone: (289) 891-9592
Fax: (289) 891-9591
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

470 Bronte St
Milton ON  L9T 2X6
Canada
Phone: (905) 814-2300
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 480-6100
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1 Princess Anne Dr
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B5
Canada
Phone: (905) 873-0111
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Suite 407
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Canada
Phone: (289) 891-9592
Fax: (289) 891-9591
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adetunji James Ade-Conde Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ade-Conde ( CPSO# 97205 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
118 Mill Street
Halton Hills ON  L7G 2C5
Phone Number: (289) 891-9592

Business Address:
407-3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone Number: (289) 891-9592

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ireland
New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 22 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADETUNJI JAMES ADE-CONDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADE-CONDE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jan 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Jan 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2013