Adekoya, David Adekunle (CPSO#: 86082)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Mar 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Mar 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:State University of New York-Stony Brook, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

13158 Tecumseh Rd East
Unit 4
Tecumseh ON  N8N 3T6
Canada
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

60 park Street West
Windsor ON  N9A 6W8
Canada
Phone: 519 254 0008
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Adekoya Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 22 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Adekoya ( CPSO# 86082 )

Business Address:
WRH Metropolitan Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Business Address:
60 Park Street West
Windsor ON  N9A 7A8
Phone Number: (519) 254-0008

Business Address:
13185 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh ON  N8N 3T6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 09 Oct 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ADEKUNLE ADEKOYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADEKOYA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Mar 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2011