Adel, Anoushirvan (CPSO#: 87702)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Department of Psychiatry
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 876-5028
Fax: (705) 876-5013
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Adel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Adel ( CPSO# 87702 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Department of Psychiatry
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5028

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Pennsylvania
USA - West Virginia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Apr 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANOUSHIRVAN ADEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Sep 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2008