Adelstein, Mitchell Steven (CPSO#: 95171)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Boston University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Room 1NE 126
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6165
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mitchell Adelstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Adelstein ( CPSO# 95171 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Room 1NE 126
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6165

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Dec 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 13 Dec 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Dec 2012 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Mitchell Steven Adelstein may practise medicine independently in emergency
            medicine, only.