Adelstein, Raquel (CPSO#: 72297)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
815 College Street
Toronto ON  M6G 1C9
Phone: (416) 923-5500
Fax: (416) 923-2249
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Raquel Adelstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Adelstein ( CPSO# 72297 )

Business Address:
206 - 815 College Street
Toronto ON  M6G 1C9
Phone Number: (416) 923-9606

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAQUEL ADELSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADELSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000