Adeyinka, Adewale (CPSO#: 95234)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:University of Ibadan, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone: (705) 474-8600 Ext. 2938
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adewale Adeyinka Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 22 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Adeyinka ( CPSO# 95234 )

Business Address:
North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nigeria
USA - Connecticut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADEWALE ADEYINKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADEYINKA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Laboratory Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Laboratory Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016