Adie, Mohammad Amin (CPSO#: 88237)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aleppo, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
Division of Neonatology
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 255-6741
Fax: (519) 255-1735
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3335 Dougall Avenue
Suit 101
Windsor ON  N9E 1S8
Canada
Phone: (519) 946-1110
Fax: (519) 915-3143
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. A. Adie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Adie ( CPSO# 88237 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
Division of Neonatology
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 255-6741

Business Address:
Suite 101
3335 Dougall Avenue
Windsor ON  N9E 1S8
Phone Number: (519) 946-1110

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 10 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD AMIN ADIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADIE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Oct 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Jan 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2010