Adrian Gutierrez, Javier (CPSO#: 93865)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Sep 2014

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 22 Sep 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Salamanca, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health
Department of Pediatrics
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dundas Medical Centre
Suite 306
220 Dundas Street West
Whitby ON  L1N 8M7
Canada
Phone: (905) 665-9001
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Javier Adrian Gutierrez Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Adrian Gutierrez ( CPSO# 93865 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health
Department of Pediatrics
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
220 Dundas Street West
Suite 306
Whitby ON  L1N 8M7
Phone Number: (905) 665-9001

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Spain

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 22 Sep 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Sep 2014
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Apr 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Javier Adrian Gutierrez may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Paediatrics, Queen's University, in which Dr. Adrian Gutierrez
                        holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Adrian Gutierrez no longer holds the
                  academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Adrian
                        Gutierrez's clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment,
                        professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Adrian Gutierrez's
                        certificate of registration, following consideration of the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on September 22, 2014, and expires on June 30,
                  2019.  Upon renewal of Dr. Adrian Gutierrez's academic appointment at
                  Queen's University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the
                  limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.