Afolabi, Oluwatola (CPSO#: 90279)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Dec 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chancellors Way Medical Arts Centre
Suite 104, 175 Chancellors Way
Research Park North
University of Guelph, main campus
Guelph ON  N1G 0E9
Phone: 226-780-5285
Fax: 855-821-1925
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Medpoint Health Care Centre
Citi Plaza
355 Wellington, Suite 233
London ON  N6A 3N7
Canada
Phone: 519-432-1919
Fax: 5194329529
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: O. Afolabi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Afolabi ( CPSO# 90279 )

Business Address:
Medpoint Health Centre
1st Floor
355 Wellington Street
London ON  N6A 3N7
Phone Number: (519) 432-1919

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OLUWATOLA AFOLABI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AFOLABI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 11 Mar 2009 to 25 Mar 2009
Elective Trainee - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Apr 2011 to 29 Apr 2011
Elective Trainee - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2012 to 19 Nov 2012
Elective Trainee - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Mar 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2012