Agarwal, Anshi (CPSO#: 97677)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Greenbelt Family Health Team
3500 Fallowfield Road
Ottawa ON  K2J 4A7
Phone: (613) 843-1718
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anshi Agarwal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 28 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Agarwal ( CPSO# 97677 )

Business Address:
99 Kakulu Road
Kanata ON  K2L 3C8
Phone Number: (613) 592-1448

Business Address:
Greenbelt Family Health Team
Suite 1C
3500 Fallowfield Road
Ottawa ON  K2M 4A7
Phone Number: (613) 843-1718

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANSHI AGARWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGARWAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2014