Agarwal, Payal (CPSO#: 96085)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
Family Practice Health Centre
77 Grenville St.
Toronto ON  M5S1B3
Phone: 416-323-6060
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Payal Agarwal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 20 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Agarwal ( CPSO# 96085 )
Dr. S. Agarwal ( CPSO# 50055 )

Business Address:
3rd Floor
77 Greenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B3
Phone Number: (416) 323-6060

Business Address:
C4U - 80 Workman Way
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,- Russell Street Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAYAL AGARWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGARWAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013