Agarwal, Vikas (CPSO#: 81205)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1815 Ironstone Manor Suite 15B
Pickering ON  L1W3W9
Phone: 905-831-1800
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vikas Agarwal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Agarwal ( CPSO# 81205 )

Business Address:
Suite 15B
1815 Ironstone Manor
Pickering ON  L1W 3W9
Phone Number: (905) 831-1800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIKAS AGARWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGARWAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2006

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: June 20, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)