Aggarwal, Aaron Neil (CPSO#: 85075)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Limestone City Sleep Lab
Suite 110
920 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1H1
Phone: (613) 547-9172
Fax: (613) 547-9910
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kingston General Hospital
Division of Internal Medicine
Etherington Hall - 3rd Floor
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Canada
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Medsleep Pembroke
Ottawa Valley Health Centre
715 MacKay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Canada
Phone: 613-735-2358
Fax: 613-735-9301
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aaron Aggarwal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 07 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Aggarwal ( CPSO# 85075 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Division of Internal Medicine
Etherington Hall Room 3043
94 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6

Business Address:
715 MacKay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone Number: (613) 735-2358

Business Address:
110 - 920 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1H1
Phone Number: (613) 547-9172

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 28 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AARON NEIL AGGARWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGGARWAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Jul 2006 to 04 Aug 2006
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2009