Aggarwal, Anita (CPSO#: 84838)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Dec 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 11 Dec 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Gulbarga University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Woodstock General Hospital
Department of Medicine
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone: (519) 421-4211
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Life Clinic
101 Queensway West
Mississauga
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Canada
Phone: (905) 366-0053
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

167 Rolph St
Tillsonburg
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9
Canada
Phone: (519) 842-3611
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A Aggarwal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Aggarwal ( CPSO# 84838 )

Business Address:
167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9

Business Address:
Woodstock General Hospital
Department of Medicine
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 421-4211

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jun 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 23 Jun 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jun 2010 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Anita  Aggarwal  may practise medicine independently in internal medicine,
            only.