Aggarwal, Dhiraj (CPSO#: 79039)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hosp of Eastern Ontario
Mental Health Outpatient Services
Suite 200
311 McArthur Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1L 8M3
Phone: (613) 738-6990
Fax: (613) 738-4891
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2485 Dwight Crescent
Ottawa ON  K1G 1C7
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3407
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dhiraj Aggarwal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Aggarwal ( CPSO# 79039 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Mental Health Outpatient Services
311 McArthur Avenue
Suite 200
Ottawa ON  K1L 8M3
Phone Number: (613) 738-6990

Business Address:
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 738-6990

Business Address:
2485 Dwight Crescent
Ottawa ON  K1G 1C7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DHIRAJ AGGARWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGGARWAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008