Aggarwal, Neera (CPSO#: 91204)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Punjabi University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Richmond Medical Clinic
2-6265 Perth Street,
Richmond, ON
K0A 2Z0
Richmond ON  K0A 2Z0
Phone: (613) 838-2093
Fax: (613) 838-2152
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Strandherd Crossing Medical Centre
3161 Strandherd Drive
Ottawa ON  K2J 5N1
Canada
Phone: (613) 823-7766
Fax: (613) 823-0063
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Neera Aggarwal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Aggarwal ( CPSO# 91204 )

Business Address:
6206 Perth Street
Richmond ON  K0A 2Z0
Phone Number: (613) 838-2093

Business Address:
Strandherd Crossing Medical Centre
3161 Strandherd Drive
Suite 305
Nepean ON  K2J 4V1
Phone Number: (613) 823-7766

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEERA AGGARWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGGARWAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 21 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 22 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 01 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2011