Aggarwal, Sandeep K (CPSO#: 84234)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
OakMed Family Health Team
231 Oak Park Boulevard
Suite 110
Oakville ON  L6H 7S8
Phone: (905) 901-5111
Fax: (905) 901-5122
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Village of Erin Meadows LTC
2930 Erin Centre Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L5M 7M4
Canada
Phone: (905) 569-7155
Fax: (905)569-8617
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Sheridan Campus Health Services
7899 Mclaughlin Road
Brampton ON  L6V 1G6
Canada
Phone: (905) 459-7533 Ext. 5153
Fax: 905) 874-4388
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Chartweel Oakville Retirement
180 Oak Park Blvd
Oakville ON  L6H 0A6
Canada
Phone: 2896442959
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sandeep K. Aggarwal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Aggarwal ( CPSO# 84234 )

Business Address:
OakMed Family Health Team
231 Oak Park Boulevard
Suite 110
Oakville ON  L6H 7S8
Phone Number: (905) 901-5111

Business Address:
7899 Mclaughlin Road
C210
Brampton ON  L6Y 5H9
Phone Number: (905) 459-7533

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
2930 Erin Centre Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L5M 7M4
Phone Number: (905) 569-7155

Business Address:
180 Oak Park Boulevard
Oakville ON  L6H 0A6
Phone Number: (289) 644-2959

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDEEP K AGGARWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGGARWAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008