Aghel, Nazanin (CPSO#: 94670)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jan 2011

Expiry Date:  22 Mar 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 24 Mar 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:BABOL UNIVERSITY OF HEALTH SCIENCES, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Cardiology
200 Elizabeth street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Seyed Hosseini-Moghaddam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Aghel ( CPSO# 94670 )
Dr. S. Hosseini Moghaddam ( CPSO# 92031 )

Business Address:
University Hospital
399 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Centre
Suite B3-420
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 663-3840

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAZANIN AGHEL shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. AGHEL is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. AGHEL shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AGHEL is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. AGHEL shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. AGHEL is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. AGHEL no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 22 Mar 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2011 to 23 Mar 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Mar 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Mar 2012
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 23 Mar 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 24 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 22 Mar 2018
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 23 Mar 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 22 Mar 2019
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Mar 2019