Agid, Ronit Farkash (CPSO#: 76590)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:The Hebrew University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medical Imaging
UHN - Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
3 McLaughlin Wing Room 425
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5800 Ext. 3404
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017


Corporation Name: Ronit Agid Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Agid ( CPSO# 76590 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
399 Bathurst Street
3 McLaughlin Wing - Room 425
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Israel

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 03 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2010 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Ronit Farkash Agid may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical
                        Imaging, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Agid holds an academic
                        appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate  of  registration  automatically expires when Dr. Agid no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.