Agila, Nizar Fathi Saleh (CPSO#: 84191)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 11 Mar 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Mar 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Garyounis University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 04 May 2006 to 11 Oct 2006
PEAP - Resident - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 12 Oct 2006 to 23 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2007 to 23 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2008 to 23 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2009 to 23 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2010 to 23 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2011 to 31 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2012 to 31 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 13 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 14 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 May 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Oct 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Mar 2018