Ahern, Stephane Patrick (CPSO#: 83065)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 May 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jul 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jul 2010