Ahluwalia, Romy Romeet (CPSO#: 93639)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Avenue plastic surgery
1802 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5M 3Z1
Phone: 416-789-9979
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 12 Jul 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROMY ROMEET AHLUWALIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHLUWALIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 12 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 12 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 12 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 12 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 13 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2015