Ahluwalia, Simran (CPSO#: 81400)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jan 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjabi University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Child & Parent Resource Institute
Department of Paediatrics
600 Sanatorium Road
London ON  N6H 3W7
Phone: (516) 858-2774
Fax: (519) 858-1917
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Harleen Bhandal Medicine
Professional Corporation
Suite Lower C
568 Christina Street North
Sarnia ON  N7T 5W6
Canada
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01

Family Health Team
1261 Beaverbrook Avenue
London, Ontario, N6H 0G6
London ON  N6H 0G6
Canada
Phone: (519) 432-4107 Ext. 233
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

60 Chesley Avenue
London ON  N5Z 2C1
Canada
Phone: 519 433 8424
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Simran Ahluwalia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 02 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ahluwalia ( CPSO# 81400 )

Business Address:
Child & Parent Resource Institute
Department of Paediatrics
600 Sanatorium Road
London ON  N6H 3W7

Business Address:
LHSC
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
Lower C Suite
568 Christina Street North
Sarnia ON  N7T 5W6
Phone Number: (519) 601-0876

Business Address:
Victoria Family Medical Centre
60 Chesley Avenue
London ON  N5Z 2C1

Business Address:
1261 Beaverbrook Avenue
London ON  N6H 0G6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Dec 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIMRAN AHLUWALIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHLUWALIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2009 to 30 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2010